Sang, Richard Tsoi Mook (CPSO#: 26406)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Shouldice Hospital 7750 Bayview Ave Thornhill ON L3T 4A3
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 19 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017