Sangaralingham, Sinnadurai (CPSO#: 22668)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gibb Street Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 03 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016