Sangers, Caroline Ann (CPSO#: 70278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: Macleod, Caroline Ann (used until: 31 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess Stree
Kingston ON  K7M 3E2
Phone: (613) 536-5277
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CFB Kingston Healthcare Clinic
P O Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Canada
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 4817
Fax: (613) 541-4437
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Sangers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sangers ( CPSO# 70278 )

Business Address:
U Cosmetic Inc
1324 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7M 3E2
Phone Number: (613) 536-5277

Business Address:
33 Health Services Centre
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANN SANGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998