Sangha, Gurinder Singh (CPSO#: 81126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Paediatric Emergency Department
Room E1-105
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58134
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.S. Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sangha ( CPSO# 81126 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Paediatric Emergency Department
Room E1-105
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008