Sangha, Harpreet Singh (CPSO#: 82735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 131 3
7th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 4520
Fax: (416) 597-7074
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harpreet Sangha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sangha ( CPSO# 82735 )

Business Address:
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
6 Lansing Square
Toronto ON  M2J 1T5
Phone Number: (416) 489-0711

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARPREET SINGH SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010