Sangster, John Forbes (CPSO#: 21383)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John F. Sangster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Byron Family Medical Centre 1228 Commissioners Road West London ON N6K 1C7
Date Received: 23 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Mar 2017