Sanh, William (CPSO#: 106452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Department of Anesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75170
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM SANH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SANH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SANH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SANH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SANH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SANH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SANH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018