Sanjeevan, Nadarajah (CPSO#: 87451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Liverpool, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone: 9054752353
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Malaysia
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADARAJAH SANJEEVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANJEEVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012