Sankar, Tejas (CPSO#: 88473)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 27 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012