Sankat, Nadya (CPSO#: 81374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone: (905) 785-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadya Sankat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sankat ( CPSO# 81374 )

Business Address:
West Mississauga Medical
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADYA SANKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANKAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006