Sankey, Christopher Lloyd (CPSO#: 62565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Satellite Clinic
21 Strickland Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M6K 3E6
Phone: (416) 537-9346
Fax: (416) 537-2598
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LLOYD SANKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANKEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1991