Sansoucy, Jacques (CPSO#: 42472)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 24 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005