Santin, Jose Luis (CPSO#: 97761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Santin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Santin ( CPSO# 97761 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSE LUIS SANTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014