Santoro, Dino (CPSO#: 77854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3384 STATE ROUTE 22 STE 4
Peru NY  12972-5305
United States
Phone: 518-643-5550
Fax: 518-643-5553
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UVMHN - CVPH
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  12901
United States
Phone: 518-561-2000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINO SANTORO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTORO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007