Santos, Ariel Pablo (CPSO#: 92484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Texas Tech Health
Department of Surgery
1400 S. Coulter Street
Amarillo TX  79106
United States
Phone: (717) 805-9690
Fax: (806) 354-5693
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Santos Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 16 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIEL PABLO SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011