Santos, Claudia Chimisso Dos (CPSO#: 71401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 4-008
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3198
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA CHIMISSO DOS SANTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANTOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2001