Saperson, Karen (CPSO#: 63014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
West 5th Campus
Room B540
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 36782
Fax: (905) 381-5613
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saperson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saperson ( CPSO# 63014 )

Business Address:
Ron Joyce
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN SAPERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992