Sapir, Daniel (CPSO#: 64566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2435 Ninth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 7G9
Phone: (289) 725-8910
Fax: (289) 725-8066
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Sapir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sapir ( CPSO# 64566 )

Business Address:
2435 Ninth Line
Oakville ON  L6H 7G9
Phone Number: (289) 725-8910

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL SAPIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1995