Sapra, Sheetal (CPSO#: 54061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inst of Cosmetic and Laser Surgery
Suite 100
1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone: (905) 842-2262
Fax: (905) 842-3625
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEETAL SAPRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1990