Sarabia, Alicia (CPSO#: 63675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Sarabia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sarabia ( CPSO# 63675 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICIA SARABIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARABIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 6 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992