Sarai, Didar Singh (CPSO#: 67421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Names: Kang, Didar Singh (used until: 28 Oct 1998 )     Sarai, Didar Singh (used until: 10 Nov 1993 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Cottrelle Blvd, unit 301
Brampton ON  L6S-0E1
Phone: (905) 791-9970
Fax: (905) 791-6082
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIDAR SINGH SARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993