Saran, Savneet Kaur Sonia (CPSO#: 108741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone: 905-794-4088
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia Saran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saran ( CPSO# 108741)

Business Address:
4515 Ebenezer Road
Suite 113
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 794-4088

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Oct 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Savneet  Kaur  Sonia  Saran  may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.