Saranchuk, Peter William (CPSO#: 63879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridges C H C
1485 Garrison Road
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1P8
Phone: 9058717621
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM SARANCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARANCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992