Sarao, Manjot (CPSO#: 101087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
157 Yonge Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: 416 362 8822
Fax: 416 362 8877
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANJOT SARAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015