Saraza, Milagros Ferreria (CPSO#: 29199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Ilocano, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramalea Health Centre
Suite 302
18 Kensington Road
Bramalea ON  L6T 4S5
Phone: (905) 791-5246
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 24 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Milagros Ferreria
            Saraza, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Saraza to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. MILAGROS FERRERIA SARAZA
                                          ("Dr. Saraza")
                  
                                                to
                  
                  COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Saraza, certificate of registration number 29199, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that as a result of concerns regarding my
                  knowledge, skill and judgment, I signed an undertaking with the College
                  on October 24, 2016 (the "2016 Undertaking") by which I was to practise
                  under the guidance of a clinical supervisor pending my resignation from
                  the College on June 1, 2017. I understand and agree that the present
                  undertaking (the "2017 Undertaking") replaces the 2016 Undertaking and
                  that I will be released from the 2016 Undertaking effective the date I
                  sign and return to the College the 2017 Undertaking.

            (3)   I, Dr. Saraza, understand and agree that the 2017 Undertaking does not in
                  any way preclude any future assessment, including a peer and practice
                  assessment, of my practice under the College's quality assurance program.   

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.  

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake that I will cease to provide care or
                        treatment to any individual who is under the age of eighteen (18)
                        years. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake that I will cease to accept any new
                        patients or otherwise provide care or treatment to any individuals
                        other than those patients with whom I have an existing
                        doctor-patient relationship and who are part of my practice at the
                        time that I sign this 2017 Undertaking (my "Existing Patients"). 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this 2017
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (7)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
                  College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                  the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake to provide the College with the names and OHIP
                  numbers of all of my Existing Patients within five (5) days of executing
                  this 2017 Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Saraza, undertake to post a sign at each and every one of my
                  Practice Location(s), in the form at Appendix "A." 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, Medical Director, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Saraza's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result: 
                  
                              -     Dr. Saraza will not provide care or treatment to any
                                    individual who is under eighteen (18) years of age.
                  
                              -     Dr. Saraza will not accept any new patients or
                                    otherwise provide care or treatment to any individuals
                                    other than those patients with whom she had an existing
                                    doctor-patient relationship on the date of her
                                    undertaking to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Saraza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Saraza, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Saraza, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Saraza, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 24, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Milagros Ferreria Saraza to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 24, 2017:

Concerns were identified with respect to Dr. Saraza’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

• Dr. Saraza will not provide care or treatment to any individual who is under eighteen (18) years of age.

• Dr. Saraza will not accept any new patients or otherwise provide care or treatment to any individuals other than those patients with whom she had an existing doctor-patient relationship on the date of her undertaking to the College.