Sarbu, Claudia Luminita (CPSO#: 91348)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2010 to 30 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2015 to 28 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2016