Sarca, Dana (CPSO#: 79731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CPM Centers for Pain Management
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 288-1045
Fax: (905) 858-2144
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Canada
Phone: (905)846-9911
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]

            As from September 28, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Dana Sarca, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sarca to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of     
                  
                                          DR. DANA SARCA
                                          ("Dr. Sarca")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sarca, certificate of registration number 79731, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that the College received a complaint bearing
                  File Number 100799 about my management of chronic non-malignant pain and
                  prescribing of opioids.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review materials and have an initial meeting to discuss
                              practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me and review at least twenty (20) of my patient
                              charts once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              three (3) months, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as any concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Sarca, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Sarca, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education (the "Professional Education")
                        at the next available opportunity:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in opioid
                              prescribing; 
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B"; and
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. The College will
                        determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully
                        completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted pursuant to this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sarca, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Sarca, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (6)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarca, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarca, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sarca, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Sarca was the subject of a complaint about her management of
                        chronic non-malignant pain and prescribing of opioids. As a result:
                  
                        *     Dr. Sarca will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                        *     Dr. Sarca will engage in professional education and
                              self-study in opioid prescribing.
                        *     Dr. Sarca's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Sarca, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (14)  I, Dr. Sarca, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Sarca, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Sarca, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately, and acknowledge that a breach by me of any
                  provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional
                  misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified
                  allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dana Sarca to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 28, 2016:

Dr. Sarca was the subject of a complaint about her management of chronic non-malignant pain and prescribing of opioids. As a result:

Dr. Sarca will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Sarca will engage in professional education and self-study in opioid prescribing.

Dr. Sarca’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.