Sardana, Vandit (CPSO#: 97937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
Room HGH SN06
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46607
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANDIT SARDANA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SARDANA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SARDANA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SARDANA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SARDANA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SARDANA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SARDANA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018