Sardana, Varun (CPSO#: 99446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.Sardana Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sardana ( CPSO# 99446 )

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
104 - 2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARUN SARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 22 Nov 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015