Sarfaraz, Mohammad Omair (CPSO#: 100849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAIR SARFARAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFARAZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017