Sarfraz, Saad (CPSO#: 87940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington District Memorial
Hospital
Emergency Department
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-3033
Fax: (519) 322-0702
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Windsor Urgent Care Center
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Canada
Phone: (519) 255-9185
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saad Sarfraz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sarfraz ( CPSO# 87940 )

Business Address:
West Windsor Urgent Care Center
2055 Huron Church Road
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Phone Number: (519) 255-9185

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
Emergency Department
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-3033

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAAD SARFRAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARFRAZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2011