Sargeant, Robert James (CPSO#: 74838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite C C 4-140
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3445
Fax: (416) 864-5714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Sargeant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sargeant ( CPSO# 74838 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite C C 4-140
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES SARGEANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARGEANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004