Sarkar, Ujjaini (CPSO#: 87406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2H8
Phone: (519) 754-3536
Fax: (519) 754-0897
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tapas Mondal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Sarkar ( CPSO# 87406 )
Dr. T. Mondal ( CPSO# 80525 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Paediatric Cardiology 3A 35
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Ujjaini Sarkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Sarkar ( CPSO# 87406 )
Dr. T. Mondal ( CPSO# 80525 )

Business Address:
115 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2H6
Phone Number: (519) 754-3536

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UJJAINI SARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010