Sarrazin, Frederic (CPSO#: 89299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Emergency Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: F. Sarrazin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Emergency Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERIC SARRAZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARRAZIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010