Sarrazin, Josee (CPSO#: 66362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Department of Radiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5732
Fax: (416) 480-5855
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )

Business Address:
Evaluative Clinical Sciences
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G147 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6048


Corporation Name: Dr. Josee Sarrazin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. M. Schull ( CPSO# 61754 )

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
M-Ground - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4M 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100


Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. M. Haider ( CPSO# 57221 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEE SARRAZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARRAZIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1994