Sarup, Brij Mohan (CPSO#: 28787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BM Sarup Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Sarup ( CPSO# 28787 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Wharncliffe Walk in Clinic 201-240 Wharncliffe Road North London ON N6H 4P2 Tel: (519) 435-0111
Instructions: Record requests should be forwarded to Wharncliffe Walk in Clinic
Date Received: 14 Jun 2017


Address: Cherryhill Medical Clinic Unit 22 301 Oxford Street West London, ON N6H 1S6
Date Received: 02 Jun 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Undertaking 1 of 2

            As from January 6, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Brij Mohan Sarup, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sarup to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. BRIJ MOHAN SARUP
                                          ("Dr. Sarup")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sarup, certificate of registration number 28787, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215622 (the "Investigation") into my prescribing of
                  controlled drugs including narcotics.  
            (4)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have not practiced medicine since June
                  30, 2015.

            (5)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have concurrently executed an
                  Undertaking to Cease to Prescribe Narcotics in addition to this
                  Undertaking and that the Undertaking to Cease to Prescribe Narcotics will
                  continue in force and effect in the event that the College approves my
                  return to practice as set out in this Undertaking.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (7)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake that I will not practise medicine in Ontario
                  until each and every one of the following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   I abide by the College's Re-Entry to Practice policy, even if I
                        have not been out of practice for a period of time that would
                        ordinarily trigger the Re-Entry to Practice policy, and the College
                        approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the date I ceased to practise
                  and before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  As set out in section
                  7(c) above, I also undertake to abide by the College's "Re-entering
                  Practice" Policy, a copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (10)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the ICR Committee may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Sarup was the subject of a College investigation into his
                              prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics.  Dr.
                              Sarup has not practiced medicine since June 30, 2015.  In the
                              face of the investigation Dr. Sarup has agreed to cease to
                              practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot
                              see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Sarup, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            Undertaking 2 of 2

            As from January 6, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Brij Mohan Sarup, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sarup to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
                  
                  UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR.  BRIJ MOHAN SARUP
                                          ("Dr. Sarup")
                  
                                                to
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sarup, certificate of registration number 28787, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215622 (the "Investigation") into my prescribing of
                  controlled drugs including narcotics.  
            (4)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have not practiced medicine since June
                  30, 2015.

            (5)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have concurrently executed a Cease to
                  Practice Undertaking in addition to this Undertaking and that this
                  Undertaking will continue in force and effect in the event that the
                  College approves my return to practice as set out in the Cease to
                  Practice Undertaking. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (7)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarup, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter
                        to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.

            (8)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances
                  referred to in section (7)(c) above that are presently in my possession,
                  in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in
                  the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (9)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Sarup must not prescribe any of the following: 
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (11)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (11)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Sarup, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (11)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (11)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (16)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Sarup was the subject of a College investigation into his
                        prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics.  In the face
                        of the investigation Dr. Sarup has agreed that:
                  
                        He must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions
                        for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. Sarup must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
                        all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. Sarup must not prescribe any of the following: 
                                    -     Narcotic Drugs
                                    -     Narcotic Preparations
                                    -     Controlled Drugs
                                    -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Sarup, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                  interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                  patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Sarup, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Sarup, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (21)  I, Dr. Sarup, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brij Mohan Sarup to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2017:

Dr. Sarup was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics. Dr. Sarup has not practiced medicine since June 30, 2015. In the face of the investigation Dr. Sarup has agreed to cease to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.


Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brij Mohan Sarup to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2017:

Dr. Sarup was the subject of a College investigation into his prescribing of controlled drugs including narcotics. In the face of the investigation Dr. Sarup has agreed that:

He must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Sarup must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Sarup must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca