Sarwal, Shailini Rani (CPSO#: 68827)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2005