Sas, Sandra Lynn (CPSO#: 64037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: Unger, Sandra Lynn (used until: 12 Feb 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
212 4th Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 1Y9
Phone: (807) 467-8770
Fax: (807) 467-2666
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

6 Matheson Street S
Kenora ON  P9N 1T5
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-5749
Fax: (807) 468-3363
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra L. Sas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sas ( CPSO# 64037 )

Business Address:
6 Matheson Street South
Kenora ON  P9N 1T5
Phone Number: (807) 468-5749

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Business Address:
1430 River Drive
Kenora ON  P9N 1K5
Phone Number: (807) 468-2871

Business Address:
212 Fourth Avenue South
Kenora ON  P9N 1Y9
Phone Number: (807) 468-8770

Business Address:
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN SAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992