Sas, Silvia Emilia Margaret (CPSO#: 59710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 Palladium Drive
Suite 100
Kanata ON  K2V 1A8
Phone: (613) 592-1707
Fax: (613) 592-9799
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Silvia Sas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sas ( CPSO# 59710 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
350 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1707

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVIA EMILIA MARGARET SAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989