Sasal, Joanna Teresa (CPSO#: 68373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Suite 332
Sunnyside Building West
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6227
Fax: (416) 530-6233
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanna Sasal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sasal ( CPSO# 68373 )

Business Address:
St. Joesph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Building West
332 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA TERESA SASAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SASAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999