Sasseville, Francoise (CPSO#: 23605)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Sasseville-Brisson, Francoise (used until: 27 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008