Sassi, Roberto Britto (CPSO#: 90365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 04 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Youth Mental Health Progr
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
237 Barton St. E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77294
Fax: (905) 521-7963
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mood Disorders Program
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th St.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35448
Fax: (905) 381-5629
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sassi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sassi ( CPSO# 90365 )
Dr. R. Sassi ( CPSO# 105755)

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Centre
Department of Psychiatry
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTO BRITTO SASSI may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY AND BEHAVIOURAL NEUROSCIENCES, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SASSI holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SASSI may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SASSI no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SASSI no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SASSI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2017