Sastry, Sunita Garikipati (CPSO#: 88290)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunita G. Sastry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital, Anesthesia, McL2-405, 399 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 20 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015