Satenstein, Gary Howard (CPSO#: 53670)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Mar 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009