Sathya, Jinka Rudrappa (CPSO#: 58815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: Sathyanarayana, Jinka Rudrappa (used until: 10 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Telugu

Education:Bangalore University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr.H.B.Murphy Cancer Centre
300 Prince Philip Drive
St.John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-2440
Fax: (709) 777-8756

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JINKA RUDRAPPA SATHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1991