Sathya, Pushpa (CPSO#: 71222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2002


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tulu

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2J 736, Janeway Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics/Faculty of
300, Prince Philip Drive, St.John's
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-4869
Fax: (709) 738-4151

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. PUSHPA SATHYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002