Satka-Susicka, Veronika (CPSO#: 107384)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 15 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016