Satkunaratnam, Abheha (CPSO#: 71197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Dept. of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
61 Queen Street East - 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-7480
Fax: (416) 864-5396
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
Department of Gynaecology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
Fax: (416) 864-5396
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abheha Satkunaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Satkunaratnam ( CPSO# 71197 )

Business Address:
Women's Health Care Centre
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7480

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Gynaecology
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-7744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHEHA SATKUNARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATKUNARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002