Satok, David Andrew (CPSO#: 64105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
3rd Floor
333 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 1G9
Phone: (416) 935-6688
Fax: (416) 935-4211
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
8200 Dixie Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0C1
Canada
Phone: (647) 747-9355
Fax: (647) 747-9350
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Satok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Satok ( CPSO# 64105 )

Business Address:
Rogers Communications Inc
Corporate Health Services
3rd Floor - 333 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 1G9
Phone Number: (416) 935-4210

Business Address:
8200 Dixie Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0C1
Phone Number: (647) 747-9355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANDREW SATOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1992