Sator-Kulic, Zehra Mustafa (CPSO#: 28605)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Sarajevo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006